THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:16:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 16 Nov 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Feb 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2012