THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 04:08:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 464-4500
Extension: 5214
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akhter Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Jul 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 464-4500
Extension: 5214
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akhter Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Jul 2019

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Aug 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 01 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Akhter Saeed may practise medicine independently in an emergency
department, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Akhter Saeed may practise medicine independently in an emergency
department, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2012