THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
737 Parkdale Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 7985555
Extension: 82545
Fax: 613-738-8434

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 08 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
737 Parkdale Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 1J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 7985555
Extension: 82545
Fax: 613-738-8434

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 08 Oct 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANA KENSHIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENSHIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANA KENSHIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENSHIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 May 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 May 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2012