THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/04/25 02:32:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
EL - Internal Medicine
01 Dec 2014 to 01 Jun 2015
University of Toronto
EL - Hematology
05 Apr 2012 to 02 May 2012
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: EL - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Dec 2014 to 01 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: EL - Hematology
DATE: 05 Apr 2012 to 02 May 2012
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 May 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 May 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2012