THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:04:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Department of Family Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7147
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 450 Notre Dame Ave, #10
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5K8
Phone: 7056731116
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Feb 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Forrest Long Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Health Sciences North
Department of Family Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 523-7147
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 450 Notre Dame Ave, #10
Sudbury Ontario P3C 5K8
Phone: 7056731116
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Feb 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 03 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Espanola General Hospital
LOCATION: Espanola

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Forrest Long Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
19 Sep 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 19 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Bradley Forrest Long may practise medicine independently in family
medicine, only.



VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Bradley Forrest Long may practise medicine independently in family
medicine, only.



Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Mar 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2012
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2012