THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:42:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Yale University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: U H N Princess Margaret Cancer
Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
OPG 7-815 - 610 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Extension: 5485
Fax: (416) 946-6546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Jan 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Yale University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: U H N Princess Margaret Cancer
Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
OPG 7-815 - 610 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Extension: 5485
Fax: (416) 946-6546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 23 Jan 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
23 Jan 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 23 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Marcus Otho Butler may practise medicine independently in medical oncology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Marcus Otho Butler may practise medicine independently in medical oncology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Yale University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jan 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 03 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Feb 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 03 May 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Apr 2012