THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:48:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univ of Texas Southwestern Med School, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Stuart Street
QCRI 302A
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-3022
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 16 Apr 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 16 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Univ of Texas Southwestern Med School, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Stuart Street
QCRI 302A
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-3022
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 16 Apr 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 16 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Aug 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 09 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

Dr. David Monty Berman may practise medicine independently in Anatomical
Pathology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

Dr. David Monty Berman may practise medicine independently in Anatomical
Pathology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univ of Texas Southwestern Med School, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2012
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2012