THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:26:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 301B-460 Springbank Dr
London ON N6J 0A8
Date Received: 17 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. V. Neumann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jul 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: 301B-460 Springbank Dr
London ON N6J 0A8
Date Received: 17 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. V. Neumann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jul 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 17 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2012