THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:29:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 700 - 407 McGill Street
Montréal Québec H2Y 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8882992389
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 700 - 407 McGill Street
Montréal Québec H2Y 2G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8882992389
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC JULIAN MIRESCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRESCO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC JULIAN MIRESCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRESCO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 08 Jul 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2012