THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 01:29:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, SPANISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 57337
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Apr 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, SPANISH, URDU
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 57337
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 25 Apr 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 25 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
17 Apr 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 17 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Syed Ameen Khasimuddin may practise medicine independently as a
hospitalist, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Syed Ameen Khasimuddin may practise medicine independently as a
hospitalist, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 24 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Apr 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2012
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2012