THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:49:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2221 Keele Street
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-247-4947
Fax: 365-525-2000
Address: 801 York Mills Road
Suite 209
Toronto Ontario M3B 1X7
Phone: 4166998843
Fax: 4166996094
Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Humber River Hospital Wilson Site
Division of Neurology
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: 4162421000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2221 Keele Street
Suite 301
Toronto Ontario M6M 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-247-4947
Fax: 365-525-2000
Address: 801 York Mills Road
Suite 209
Toronto Ontario M3B 1X7
Phone: 4166998843
Fax: 4166996094
Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Humber River Hospital Wilson Site
Division of Neurology
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: 4162421000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUE JIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YUE JIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 May 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 May 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012