THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:01:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Collingwood General
and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Plume Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Feb 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Collingwood General
and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 445-2550
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Plume Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Feb 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE THELMA JEAN PLUME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLUME is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE THELMA JEAN PLUME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PLUME is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012