THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/04/25 23:52:57 PM

General Information

Former Name: Johnson, Emily Rachel (Used Until: 18 Jun 2012)
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137377350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Pranger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Sep 2024

Corporation Name: Emily Pranger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: Johnson, Emily Rachel (Used Until: 18 Jun 2012)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137377350
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emily Pranger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Sep 2024

Corporation Name: Emily Pranger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY RACHEL PRANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRANGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY RACHEL PRANGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRANGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012