THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 03:44:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unison Health & Community Services
12 Flemington Road
Toronto, ON
M6A2N4
Toronto Ontario M4P 2H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-787-1661
Fax: 416-787-3761

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Aug 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients should contact the clinic where they saw Dr. Zavalishina to request a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 22 Mar 2018

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unison Health & Community Services
12 Flemington Road
Toronto, ON
M6A2N4
Toronto Ontario M4P 2H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-787-1661
Fax: 416-787-3761

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Aug 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients should contact the clinic where they saw Dr. Zavalishina to request a copy of their medical record.
Date Received: 22 Mar 2018

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YELENA ZAVALISHINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAVALISHINA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YELENA ZAVALISHINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAVALISHINA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012