THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:32:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 172 Ethel Street
Unit 1A
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 1V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055862080
Fax: 7054795100
Address: The Village - Canadore College
100 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 8K9
Phone: 705-586-2080
Fax: 705-479-5100

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 06 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 172 Ethel Street
Unit 1A
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 1V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055862080
Fax: 7054795100
Address: The Village - Canadore College
100 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 8K9
Phone: 705-586-2080
Fax: 705-479-5100

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 06 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAYA KANTHI DE ZOYSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE ZOYSA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAYA KANTHI DE ZOYSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE ZOYSA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012