THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:46:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 62 King St. West
Dundas Ontario L9H 1T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 627-3526
Fax: (905) 628-9996
Address: 41 South St W
Dundas ON L9H 4C4
Phone: 905-546-2618
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Hatt St
Dundas ON L9H 0A1
Phone: 905-628-6200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. EMMA MAZUREK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 May 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 62 King St. West
Dundas Ontario L9H 1T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 627-3526
Fax: (905) 628-9996
Address: 41 South St W
Dundas ON L9H 4C4
Phone: 905-546-2618
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Hatt St
Dundas ON L9H 0A1
Phone: 905-628-6200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. EMMA MAZUREK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 May 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMA MAE MAZUREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZUREK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMA MAE MAZUREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAZUREK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012