THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:48:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-684-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. R. Burkhart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Dec 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-684-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. R. Burkhart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Dec 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON RAYMOND BURKHART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKHART is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON RAYMOND BURKHART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURKHART is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012