THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 22:07:34 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Windsor
Student Health Services
Windsor Ontario N9B 3P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-7002
Fax: (519) 971-3637
Address: 8100 Twin Oaks Dr
Windsor ON N8N 5C2
Phone: 5199446400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Feb 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 23 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical record can contact Docudavit at: 1-888-781-9083.
Date Received: 20 Jul 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Windsor
Student Health Services
Windsor Ontario N9B 3P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 973-7002
Fax: (519) 971-3637
Address: 8100 Twin Oaks Dr
Windsor ON N8N 5C2
Phone: 5199446400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Feb 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 23 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their medical record can contact Docudavit at: 1-888-781-9083.
Date Received: 20 Jul 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KERRY ELISE MAYRAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYRAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KERRY ELISE MAYRAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYRAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012