THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/04/25 00:17:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Tapiola Crescent
2nd Floor
Ottawa Ontario K1T 2J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-738-0303
Fax: 613-738-8950

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jul 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 21 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Tapiola Crescent
2nd Floor
Ottawa Ontario K1T 2J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-738-0303
Fax: 613-738-8950

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jul 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 21 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE DANIELLE SCHERLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHERLING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLE DANIELLE SCHERLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHERLING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012