THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:40:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: Yoo, Solina Sun Kyung (Used Until: 15 Aug 2013)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Baycrest Health Sciences
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 7852500
Extension: 2488
Fax: (416) 7852409

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Solina Lim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Apr 2023

General Information

Former Name: Yoo, Solina Sun Kyung (Used Until: 15 Aug 2013)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KOREAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Baycrest Health Sciences
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 7852500
Extension: 2488
Fax: (416) 7852409

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Solina Lim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Apr 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOLINA SUN KYUNG LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOLINA SUN KYUNG LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012