THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/04/25 18:35:37 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: UNIVERSIDAD DEL CAUCA, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: UNIVERSIDAD DEL CAUCA, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: UNIVERSIDAD DEL CAUCA, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Mar 2025
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Mar 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012