THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:43:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glengrove Medical Centre
2760 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4N 2J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 481-1173
Fax: (416) 481-7431
Address: Women's College Family Practice
77 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Team BLUE
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6060
Extension: Ext. 1, 4
Fax: (416) 323-6402

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Chertkow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jan 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glengrove Medical Centre
2760 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4N 2J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 481-1173
Fax: (416) 481-7431
Address: Women's College Family Practice
77 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Team BLUE
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6060
Extension: Ext. 1, 4
Fax: (416) 323-6402

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Chertkow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jan 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH CHERTKOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERTKOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH CHERTKOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHERTKOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012