THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:22:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Parkwood Institute
Mental Health Building
550 Wellington Rd
London Ontario N6A 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Extension: 47374
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Parkwood Institute
Mental Health Building
550 Wellington Rd
London Ontario N6A 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6100
Extension: 47374
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN ESTELLE MUSSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN ESTELLE MUSSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012