THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:25:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Family Medicine Centre
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6860
Fax: 416-530-6160
Address: 1290 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6H 1N9
Phone: (416) 537-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Practice closed at Prince Edward Medical as of April 13, 2024
For records contact
Records Management Ltd
13-1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Phone at 1-800-775-0093
Fax: 1-888-316-4125
Date Received: 12 Apr 2024

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Family Medicine Centre
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6860
Fax: 416-530-6160
Address: 1290 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6H 1N9
Phone: (416) 537-7000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Practice closed at Prince Edward Medical as of April 13, 2024
For records contact
Records Management Ltd
13-1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Phone at 1-800-775-0093
Fax: 1-888-316-4125
Date Received: 12 Apr 2024

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA CURRIE HOLLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA CURRIE HOLLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOLLAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012