THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:21:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18 Yonge St
WellIOne Medical Centre
Toronto ON M5E 1Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-748-5663
Fax: 647-740-7166
Address: 2340 Dundas St W
Toronto ON M6P 4A9
Phone: 416-392-0999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 662 Jane St
Toronto ON M6N 4A7
Phone: 416-338-7272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200-489 College St
Toronto ON M6G 1A5
Phone: 416 323-9986
Fax: 416 323-0447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18 Yonge St
WellIOne Medical Centre
Toronto ON M5E 1Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-748-5663
Fax: 647-740-7166
Address: 2340 Dundas St W
Toronto ON M6P 4A9
Phone: 416-392-0999
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 662 Jane St
Toronto ON M6N 4A7
Phone: 416-338-7272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200-489 College St
Toronto ON M6G 1A5
Phone: 416 323-9986
Fax: 416 323-0447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH GHASSAN BASMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH GHASSAN BASMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BASMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012