THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:36:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
6th floor Donnelly Wing North
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5408
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6137
Fax: (416) 323-6132

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 06 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
6th floor Donnelly Wing North
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5408
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St
4th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-6137
Fax: (416) 323-6132

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 06 Nov 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JORDAN TAYLOR KOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOURI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JORDAN TAYLOR KOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOURI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012