THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:58:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6235
Fax: 416-530-6656
Address: Multi-Speciality Walk in Clinic
21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
Phone: 905-897-9228
Fax: (905)-897-7780

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Habeeb Majeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Sep 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-6235
Fax: 416-530-6656
Address: Multi-Speciality Walk in Clinic
21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
Phone: 905-897-9228
Fax: (905)-897-7780

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Habeeb Majeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Sep 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HABEEB MAJEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJEED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HABEEB MAJEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJEED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012