THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:53:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Autonoma De Madrid, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Spain

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mariscal De Alba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Oct 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Universidad Autonoma De Madrid, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Spain

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mariscal De Alba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Oct 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Autonoma De Madrid, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 08 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2012