THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:33:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-2464 Howard Ave
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 782-7246
Fax: (226) 783-2273
Address: 2464 Howard Ave Ste 106
Windsor,ON N8X 3V6
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Phone: (226) 782-7246
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Indiana
USA - Iowa
USA - Kentucky
USA - Michigan
USA - Minnesota
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charlotte Logan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106-2464 Howard Ave
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 782-7246
Fax: (226) 783-2273
Address: 2464 Howard Ave Ste 106
Windsor,ON N8X 3V6
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Phone: (226) 782-7246
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Indiana
USA - Iowa
USA - Kentucky
USA - Michigan
USA - Minnesota
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charlotte Logan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Jan 2022

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
06 Aug 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 06 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

Dr. Charlotte Ann Logan may practise medicine independently in emergency
medicine and adult chronic pain management.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon

Dr. Charlotte Ann Logan may practise medicine independently in emergency
medicine and adult chronic pain management.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Aug 2020
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Mar 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2012