THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:30:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165306000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Infirmary Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Infirmary Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165306000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Infirmary Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Infirmary Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI ZUHAIR IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI ZUHAIR IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012