THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 19:45:47 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Jul 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 Jul 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
15 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2017 to 14 Jul 2017
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
15 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2016 to 14 Jul 2016
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
DATE: 15 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 14 Jul 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
DATE: 15 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Jul 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012