THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 13:14:56 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Department of Anatomical Pathology
189 Elm St
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-631-2030
Extension: 2094
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
Department of Anatomical Pathology
189 Elm St
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-631-2030
Extension: 2094
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID GARCIA MARQUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARCIA MARQUEZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID GARCIA MARQUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARCIA MARQUEZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jan 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Oct 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012