THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:04:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1645 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3M 2X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-924-1164
Fax: (416) 633-7141
Address: 34 Simcoe St
Kinark Child and Family Services
Barrie ON L4N 6T4
Phone: 1-800-230-8534
Fax: 705-726-9181
Address: 500 Church St
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
Penetanguishene ON L9M 1G3
Phone: (705) 549-3181
Extension: 2484
Fax: (705) 526-2462
Address: 1440 Bathurst St
Kidcrew Medical
Toronto ON M5R 3J3
Phone: 416-654-5437
Fax: 647-689-2371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 03 May 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1645 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3M 2X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-924-1164
Fax: (416) 633-7141
Address: 34 Simcoe St
Kinark Child and Family Services
Barrie ON L4N 6T4
Phone: 1-800-230-8534
Fax: 705-726-9181
Address: 500 Church St
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
Penetanguishene ON L9M 1G3
Phone: (705) 549-3181
Extension: 2484
Fax: (705) 526-2462
Address: 1440 Bathurst St
Kidcrew Medical
Toronto ON M5R 3J3
Phone: 416-654-5437
Fax: 647-689-2371

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 03 May 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene
HOSPITAL: Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA ORLANDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORLANDO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA ORLANDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORLANDO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012