THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:02:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Boston University, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clear Medical Imaging
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 256-4914
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 03 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chadda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Aug 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Boston University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Clear Medical Imaging
1568 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 1K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 256-4914
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 03 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Erie Shores Healthcare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Erie Shores Healthcare
LOCATION: Leamington

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chadda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Aug 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANISH CHADDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MANISH CHADDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Boston University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012