THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:10:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
05 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2014 to 04 May 2015
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Ottawa
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
DATE: 05 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 04 May 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012