THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:15:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Thickson Rd S
Glen Hill Medical
Whitby ON L1N 7T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056740455
Fax: 9056740480
Address: 200 Bay Street
Lower Concourse Level
Toronto Ontario M5J 2J3
Phone: 416 368 6787
Fax: 416 368 7632

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 04 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 80 Thickson Rd S
Glen Hill Medical
Whitby ON L1N 7T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056740455
Fax: 9056740480
Address: 200 Bay Street
Lower Concourse Level
Toronto Ontario M5J 2J3
Phone: 416 368 6787
Fax: 416 368 7632

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Effective: 04 Oct 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology and Allergy
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERICA ANNE BERNSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNSTEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERICA ANNE BERNSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012