THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:30:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 940-100 Queen Street
LaVie Executive Health
Ottawa Ontario K1P 1J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 231-3666
Fax: (613) 233-1451
Address: Chartwell Heritage
624 Wilson St
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4S5
Phone: 613-741-1257
Fax: 613-741-8676

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 940-100 Queen Street
LaVie Executive Health
Ottawa Ontario K1P 1J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 231-3666
Fax: (613) 233-1451
Address: Chartwell Heritage
624 Wilson St
Ottawa Ontario K1K 4S5
Phone: 613-741-1257
Fax: 613-741-8676

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE-ANNE MONTPETIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTPETIT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE-ANNE MONTPETIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONTPETIT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012