THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:02:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad de Guayaquil, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3319 Bayview Ave
Rejoo Clinic
store 29B
North York ON M2K 1G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-257-3319
Fax: 647-689-2375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad de Guayaquil, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3319 Bayview Ave
Rejoo Clinic
store 29B
North York ON M2K 1G4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-257-3319
Fax: 647-689-2375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOURDES CECILIA VITERI ESPINOZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VITERI ESPINOZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOURDES CECILIA VITERI ESPINOZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VITERI ESPINOZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad de Guayaquil, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012