THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 02:47:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Regional
Health Centre
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2896 Dundas St W
Treasury Medical Centre
Toronto ON M6P 1Y8
Phone: (647) 977-5447
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ASHRAF JARBO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Apr 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashraf Jarbo and Dr. Wijdan Fadholi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 May 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Regional
Health Centre
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2896 Dundas St W
Treasury Medical Centre
Toronto ON M6P 1Y8
Phone: (647) 977-5447
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Stevenson Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Alliston

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ASHRAF JARBO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Apr 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. Ashraf Jarbo and Dr. Wijdan Fadholi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 May 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHRAF JARBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARBO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASHRAF JARBO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARBO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2012