THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:10:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
170 Colborne St W
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Date Received: 18 Mar 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marshall & Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 03 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
170 Colborne St W
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Date Received: 18 Mar 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marshall & Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 Mar 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2012