THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 02:57:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-895-4521
Extension: 2712
Fax: 905-830-5965

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-895-4521
Extension: 2712
Fax: 905-830-5965

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRA JILL TONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRA JILL TONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2012