THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:21:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kakatiya Medical College, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Jenny Trout Centre
342, Erie Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 272-2040
Fax: (519) 272-2323
Address: 1405 EDWARD STREET
HEARST
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
Phone: 17053624291
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 270 Carling Terrace
Wingham Ontario N0G2W0
Phone: (519) 357-3210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jul 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 06 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ram Gobburu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kulkarni (CPSO#: 99546 ) Dr. R. Gobburu (CPSO#: 99011 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TELUGU
Medical School: Kakatiya Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Jenny Trout Centre
342, Erie Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 272-2040
Fax: (519) 272-2323
Address: 1405 EDWARD STREET
HEARST
Hearst Ontario P0L 1N0
Phone: 17053624291
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 270 Carling Terrace
Wingham Ontario N0G2W0
Phone: (519) 357-3210
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 06 Jul 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 06 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ram Gobburu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kulkarni (CPSO#: 99546 ) Dr. R. Gobburu (CPSO#: 99011 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
02 May 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 02 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ram Mohan Gobburu may practise medicine independently in paediatrics, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ram Mohan Gobburu may practise medicine independently in paediatrics, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kakatiya Medical College, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 May 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 May 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 May 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 02 May 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2012