THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 23:37:54 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 440 Jarvis Street
SickKids Centre for Community Mental Health
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 924-1164
Extension: 3208
Fax: (416) 924-8208
Address: North Eastern Ontario Family and
Children's Services (NEOFACS)
29 Kolb Avenue
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 1G2
Phone: 705-335-2445
Fax: 705-335-4391
Address: Evergreen Health Centre
c/o Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E, 2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 1K6
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 440 Jarvis Street
SickKids Centre for Community Mental Health
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 924-1164
Extension: 3208
Fax: (416) 924-8208
Address: North Eastern Ontario Family and
Children's Services (NEOFACS)
29 Kolb Avenue
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N 1G2
Phone: 705-335-2445
Fax: 705-335-4391
Address: Evergreen Health Centre
c/o Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E, 2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M5C 1K6
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA ROSANNE PACIONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACIONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA ROSANNE PACIONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACIONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Jul 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2012