THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:10:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jaffna, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Jul 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Jaffna, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 11 Jul 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 11 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
15 Aug 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 15 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Senthilraj Nadarajah may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Senthilraj Nadarajah may practise medicine independently in internal
medicine, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jaffna, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Aug 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 2012