THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:11:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Lawrence Medical Clinic
100 - 34 Ottawa St
Morrisburg Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-543-4171
Fax: 6135434171
Address: St Lawrence Medical Clinic
2 Thorold Lane
Ingleside Ontario K0C 1M0
Phone: 613-537-2044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Winchester District Memorial Hosp
566 Louise St
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Lawrence Medical Clinic
100 - 34 Ottawa St
Morrisburg Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-543-4171
Fax: 6135434171
Address: St Lawrence Medical Clinic
2 Thorold Lane
Ingleside Ontario K0C 1M0
Phone: 613-537-2044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Winchester District Memorial Hosp
566 Louise St
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Dec 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL AARON BENSIMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENSIMON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL AARON BENSIMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENSIMON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Referral or Application: 28 Oct 2024

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Referral or Application: 28 Oct 2024

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Nov 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2012