THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:32:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2640 Rutherford Rd. Suite 200
Vaughan Ontario L4K0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-417-5500
Fax: 905-417-5508

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheila Thakkar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2640 Rutherford Rd. Suite 200
Vaughan Ontario L4K0H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-417-5500
Fax: 905-417-5508

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheila Thakkar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEILA SHETH THAKKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAKKAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEILA SHETH THAKKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THAKKAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Dec 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2012