THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:05:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Poland

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Poland

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 1998
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology
01 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology
01 Jul 2017 to 30 Nov 2017
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology
10 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Hematological Pathology
16 Dec 2016 to 09 Mar 2017
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Hematology
17 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Hematology
16 Aug 2012 to 16 Oct 2012
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology
DATE: 01 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Nov 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematological Pathology
DATE: 10 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Hematological Pathology
DATE: 16 Dec 2016 to 09 Mar 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Hematology
DATE: 17 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Hematology
DATE: 16 Aug 2012 to 16 Oct 2012
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2012