THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:04:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 2004
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Jul 2014 to 10 Aug 2014
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
10 Aug 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Aug 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
DATE: 10 Aug 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Aug 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2012