THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:15:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Selkirk and district hospital
100 Easton Dr.
Selkirk Manitoba R1A 2M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 215-10216 124 St NW
Edmonton AB T5N 4A3
Phone: 7804552273
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 1997
Gimli MB R0C 1B0
Phone: 204*642-1426
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4599 Airport Rd
clinic
Timmins ON P4N 7C3
Phone: 780-900-5649
Extension: 111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1129 Empress St
clinic
Winnipeg MB R3E 3H1
Phone: 204-338-7873
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 333 Broadway
Winnipeg MB R3C 4W3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Burron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Feb 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Selkirk and district hospital
100 Easton Dr.
Selkirk Manitoba R1A 2M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 215-10216 124 St NW
Edmonton AB T5N 4A3
Phone: 7804552273
Fax: No Information Available
Address: PO Box 1997
Gimli MB R0C 1B0
Phone: 204*642-1426
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4599 Airport Rd
clinic
Timmins ON P4N 7C3
Phone: 780-900-5649
Extension: 111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1129 Empress St
clinic
Winnipeg MB R3E 3H1
Phone: 204-338-7873
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 333 Broadway
Winnipeg MB R3C 4W3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Burron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 16 Feb 2016

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN STUART BURRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURRON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN STUART BURRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURRON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2021
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 02 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2012