THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:31:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 110
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 7L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 7370830
Fax: 705 7370679

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alasaad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Apr 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 110
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 7L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 7370830
Fax: 705 7370679

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alasaad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Apr 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANI GHALIB MOHAMMED ALASAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALASAAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANI GHALIB MOHAMMED ALASAAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALASAAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Aug 2012